|
09/12/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 295, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 5062.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 9. Page 5092.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|