Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on INS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Coms. on V.A. and INS. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2016 | Read first time. To print. |