Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2016 | Read first time. To print. |