California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1918 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 17, 2016

Amended

Bill May 10, 2016
Bill March 8, 2016