|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 745, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 5006.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 30. Page 4777.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|