California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1923 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 2, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016