Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2016 | Read first time. To print. |