California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB193 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2015

Amended

Bill September 2, 2015
Bill July 6, 2015
Bill June 22, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill April 14, 2015