California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1932 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/05/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1932AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 5, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 18, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Obernolte FEBRUARY 12, 2016 An act to  amend Section 2932 of, and to  add Section 42005.2  to   to,  the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1932, as amended, Obernolte. Vehicles:  traffic violator school.   motorcycle safety training.  Existing law provides for the licensing and administration by the Department of Motor Vehicles of traffic violator schools, operators, and instructors. Existing law authorizes a court adjudicating a traffic offense, after a deposit of bail, a plea of guilty or no contest, or a conviction, to order or permit persons who hold a specified noncommercial driver's license, or certain persons who hold a specified commercial driver's license, to attend a licensed traffic violator school. Existing law authorizes the court to continue a proceeding against that person in consideration of successful completion of a course of instruction at the licensed traffic violator school. Existing law prohibits a court from permitting a person to complete a traffic violator school program, in lieu of adjudicating an offense, if the offense occurred in a commercial vehicle or is one of specified driving offenses.  Existing law establishes a motorcyclist safety program, administered by the Commissioner of the California Highway Patrol. Existing law authorizes the commissioner to adopt standards for course content, contact hours, curriculum, instructor training and testing, and instructional quality control for a novice rider training course and a premier motorcyclist safety training program.  This bill would authorize a person who is ordered or permitted to complete a course of instruction at a licensed traffic violator school under the circumstances described above as a result of an offense committed while operating a motorcycle to instead complete an advanced-level motorcyclist safety training course, as specified.  The bill would authorize the Commissioner of the California Highway Patrol to adopt standards for course content, contact hours, curriculum, instructor training and testing, and instructional quality control for the advanced-level motorcyclist safety training course, as specified.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 2932 of the   Vehicle Code   is amended to read:  2932. The commissioner may, through contracts with other public agencies or with private entities, do all of the following: (a) Provide financial or other support to projects aimed at enhancing motorcycle operation and safety, including, but not limited to, motorcyclist safety training programs. The motorcyclist safety training programs shall comply with criteria  which   that  the commissioner, in consultation with other state agencies and national motorcycle safety organizations, may adopt to provide validated motorcyclist safety training programs in the state. (b) Sponsor and coordinate efforts aimed at increasing motorists' awareness of motorcyclists. (c) Sponsor research into effective communication techniques to reach all highway users on matters of motorcyclist safety. (d) Establish an advisory committee of persons from other state and local agencies with an interest in motorcycle safety; persons from the motorcycle industry; motorcycle safety organizations; motorcycle enthusiast organizations; and others with an interest in motorcycle safety, to assist in the establishment of a comprehensive program of motorcycle safety. (e) Adopt standards for course content, contact hours, curriculum, instructor training and testing, and instructional quality control, and setting forth a maximum amount for course fees for the novice rider training course specified in subdivisions (g) and (i) of Section 12804.9. (f) (1) Adopt standards for course content, contact hours, curriculum, instructor training and testing, and instructional quality control, for a premier motorcyclist safety training program. Motorcycle safety training courses offered under a premier motorcyclist safety training program shall meet all of the following requirements: (A) Provide a core curriculum approved for the novice rider training course specified in subdivision (e). (B) Additional course requirements established by the commissioner. (2) On and after January 1, 2008, the commissioner shall not impose a maximum amount for course fees for courses provided under the premier motorcyclist safety training program. (3) All administrative costs of a premier motorcyclist safety training program shall be paid for by the provider, and none of the costs shall be paid for by the state.  (g) Adopt standards for course content, contact hours, curriculum, instructor training and testing, and instructional quality control for an advanced-level motorcyclist training course.   (1) Safety instruction in the advanced-level motorcyclist training course shall be consistent with the curriculum prescribed by the department for traffic violator schools pursuant to Section 11202, including instruction specific to the safe and lawful operation of motorcycles.   (2) The standards for instructors and operators of the advanced-level motorcyclist training shall be consistent with the standards prescribed by the department for instructors and operators of traffic violator schools pursuant to Section 11206.   SECTION 1.   SEC. 2.  Section 42005.2 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 42005.2. A person ordered or permitted to complete a course of instruction at a licensed traffic violator school pursuant to Section 41501 or 42005 as a result of an offense committed while operating a motorcycle may instead complete an advanced-level motorcyclist safety training course established pursuant to Article 2 (commencing with Section 2930) of Chapter 5 of Division 2. The person's completion of that training course constitutes completion of a course of instruction at a licensed traffic violator school for the purposes of this code.