California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1932 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2016

Amended

Bill August 3, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016