BILL NUMBER: AB 1932AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 3, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 14, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 5, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 18, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Obernolte FEBRUARY 12, 2016 An act to add Section 11223 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1932, as amended, Obernolte. Vehicles: motorcycle safety training. Existing law provides for the licensing and administration by the Department of Motor Vehicles of traffic violator schools, operators, and instructors. Existing law authorizes the Director of Motor Vehicles to prescribe rules and regulations for traffic violator schools regarding the conduct of courses of education, including curriculum, facilities, and equipment. Existing law establishes a motorcyclist safety program, administered by the Commissioner of the California Highway Patrol. Existing law authorizes the commissioner to adopt standards for course content, contact hours, curriculum, instructor training and testing, and instructional quality control for a novice rider training course and a premier motorcyclist safety training program. This bill would authorize a motorcyclist safety training program that is licensed as a traffic violator school to administeran advanced-levela motorcyclist training course, and would authorize the course to include instruction specific to the safe and lawful operation of motorcycles in addition to the curriculum prescribed by the department for traffic violator schools. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 11223 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 11223. A motorcyclist safety training program established pursuant to Article 2 (commencing with Section 2930) of Chapter 5 of Division22, that is licensed by the department as a traffic violatorschoolschool, may administeran advanced-levela motorcyclist training course. In addition to the curriculum prescribed by the department pursuant to Section 11219, theadvanced-levelmotorcyclist training course may include instruction specific to the safe and lawful operation of motorcycles in accordance with Section 2932.