Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/08/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2016 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4786.) | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4). | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and V.A. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2016 | Read first time. To print. |