California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1941 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 5, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 22, 2016

Amended

Bill June 6, 2016
Bill April 27, 2016
Bill April 4, 2016