Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5051.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|