California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1945 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 23, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 21, 2016
Bill March 15, 2016