Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 10. Page 4356.) | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 6). | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2016 | Read first time. To print. |