Assembly | 05/18/2016 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2016 | Read first time. To print. |