Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4959.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|