07/25/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 99, Statutes of 2016. | |||
07/25/2016 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 07/11/2016 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4644.). | ||
Senate | 06/15/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4263.) | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2016 | Read first time. To print. |