LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1954
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1954
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1954
Compare Versions
AB1954 Chaptered September 23, 2016
AB1954 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB1954 Amended August 17, 2016
AB1954 Amended June 27, 2016
AB1954 Amended June 13, 2016
AB1954 Amended May 9, 2016
AB1954 Amended April 25, 2016
AB1954 Amended April 13, 2016
AB1954 Introduced February 12, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1954 Chaptered September 23, 2016
AB1954 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB1954 Amended August 17, 2016
AB1954 Amended June 27, 2016
AB1954 Amended June 13, 2016
AB1954 Amended May 9, 2016
AB1954 Amended April 25, 2016
AB1954 Amended April 13, 2016
AB1954 Introduced February 12, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare