LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1958
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1958
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1958
Compare Versions
AB1958 Chaptered September 24, 2016
AB1958 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB1958 Amended August 19, 2016
AB1958 Amended August 4, 2016
AB1958 Amended August 2, 2016
AB1958 Amended June 21, 2016
AB1958 Amended April 7, 2016
AB1958 Amended March 29, 2016
AB1958 Introduced February 12, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1958 Chaptered September 24, 2016
AB1958 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB1958 Amended August 19, 2016
AB1958 Amended August 4, 2016
AB1958 Amended August 2, 2016
AB1958 Amended June 21, 2016
AB1958 Amended April 7, 2016
AB1958 Amended March 29, 2016
AB1958 Introduced February 12, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare