California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1962 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill June 6, 2016
Bill March 30, 2016