Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 5222.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|