California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1969 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Amended

Bill May 10, 2016
Bill May 4, 2016
Bill April 21, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016
Bill April 6, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016