California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1974 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill June 8, 2016