California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1976 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 22, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016