California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1980 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 17, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill May 11, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016