Assembly | 05/09/2016 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. In committee: Reconsideration refused. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2016 | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4389.) (pending re-refer to Com. on A., E., S., T., & I.M.) | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2016 | Read first time. To print. |