California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1995 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 29, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill March 14, 2016