California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1998 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 16, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016