|
09/26/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 638, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5244.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4787.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|