Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on Senate inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 5575.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Allen. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5575.) Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5510.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 5247.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/29/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|