|
09/30/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6129.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 5054.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4677.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|