Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2015 | Read first time. To print. |