|
08/17/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 128, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5637.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4643.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4689.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/29/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|