California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2012 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 28, 2016
Bill April 7, 2016
Bill March 14, 2016