|
09/13/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 327, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 13. Page 6144.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 5067.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5166.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 7. Page 5171.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|