|
09/24/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6343.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5287.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5231.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/29/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|