BILL NUMBER: AB 2017AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 7, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 30, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member McCarty FEBRUARY 16, 2016 An act to add Part 3.3 (commencing with Section 5832) to Division 5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health, and making an appropriation therefor. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2017, as amended, McCarty. College Mental Health Services Program. Existing law, the Mental Health Services Act, an initiative measure enacted by the voters as Proposition 63 at the November 2, 2004, statewide general election, funds a system of county mental health plans for the provision of mental health services, as specified. The act provides that it may be amended by the Legislature by a 2/3 vote of each house as long as the amendment is consistent with and furthers the intent of the act. The act establishes the Mental Health Services Fund, continuously appropriated to and administered by the State Department of Health Care Services, to fund specified county mental health programs, including prevention and early intervention programs and programs implemented under the Adult and Older Adult Mental Health System of Care Act. The act authorizes the payment of administrative costs of the state from the fund in an amount not greater than 5% of the annual total deposited in the fund and otherwise specifies the distribution of moneys in the fund. Thisbillbill, until January 1, 2022, would establish the College Mental Health Services Trust Account, would transferan unspecified amount$40,000,000 annually to that account from the Mental Health Services Fund, and would appropriate those funds to the department to create a grant program for public community colleges, colleges, and universities to improve access to mental health services on campus, as specified. The bill would require campuses that have been awarded grants annually to report on the use of grant funds. By changing the funding structure approved by the voters, this bill would amend the Mental Health Services Act. The bill would state the finding of the Legislature that the measure is consistent with and furthers the purposes of the Mental Health Services Act. The bill would make other finding and declarations. Vote: 2/3. Appropriation: yes. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. (a) The Legislature finds and declares that this measure is consistent with and furthers the purposes of the Mental Health Services Act within the meaning of Section 18 of that act. (b) Students, faculty, health practitioners, and college administrators are reporting increased rates of mental health needs by students attending public colleges in California. (c) One in four students have a diagnosable mental illness and 40 percent of students do not seek mental health when they need it. (d) Eight out of 10 people who experience psychosis have their first episode between 15 and 30 years of age. (e) The demand for mental health services by public college students far outpaces the ability of colleges to provide them. California public college campuses and higher education systems do not meet national staffing standards for psychiatric services and other mental health professionals. (f) The lack of services directly impacts college students' success and academic performance as well as their ability to develop socially as productive members of society. (g) The effects of untreated mental health needs are long lasting and can include college students dropping out of school, experiencing homelessness, and dying of suicide. (h) One in 10 college students has considered suicide and suicide is the second leading cause of death among college students, claiming more than 1,100 lives every year nationally. (i) Research shows that for each dollar invested in student prevention and early intervention mental health services, California will see a return of at least six dollars ($6) and up to eleven dollars ($11) as a result of more students graduating. SEC. 2. Part 3.3 (commencing with Section 5832) is added to Division 5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read: PART 3.3. College Mental Health Services Program 5832. This part shall be known, and may be cited, as the College Mental Health Services Program Act. 5832.1. (a) There is hereby established in the State Treasury the College Mental Health Services Trust Account. Notwithstanding Section 13340 of the Government Code, moneys in the account are hereby continuously appropriated to the State Department of Health Care Services to fund the grant program established pursuant to this part. (b) Notwithstanding Section 5892 or any other law,____ dollars ($____)forty million dollars ($40,000,000) shall be transferred from the Mental Health Services Fund into the College Mental Health Services Trust Account annually. 5832.2. (a) The department, in consultation with the California Mental Health Services Authority (CalMHSA), shall create a grant program for public community colleges, colleges, and universities to improve access to mental health services and early identification or intervention programs. The department and CalMHSA shall establish guidelines for grant funding that shall include, but not be limited to, all of the following: (1) The ability of the program to fund the matching component required by subdivision (c). (2) The ability of the campus, in partnership with the local county, to establish direct linkages for students to community-based mental health services for which the students' health coverage makes them eligible, ensuring provider reimbursement. (3) The ability to participate in evidence-based and community defined best practice programs for mental health services improvements. (4) The ability of the campus to serve underserved and vulnerable populations, including, but not limited to, lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, questioning, and allied (LGBTQA) persons, victims of domestic violence and sexual abuse, and veterans. (5) The ability of the campus to reduce racial disparities in access to mental health services. (6) The ability of the campus to fund mental health stigma reduction activities. (7) The ability of the campus to provide employees and students with education and training on early identification, intervention, and referral of students with mental health needs. (b) Grants may be awarded to a community college district in the California Community College system, the California State University system, or the University of California system. The scale of the program shall determine the amount awarded, but in no case shall the department award more than five million dollars ($5,000,000) per campus, per application. (c) Grants shall only be awarded to a campus that can show a dollar-for-dollar match of funds from the campus. (d) Administrative costs associated with administering an approved program shall be limited to 5 percent for any grantee. (e) The funding provided pursuant to this part shall not be used to supplant existing state or county funds utilized to provide mental health services.(d)(f) The department and CalMHSA may provide technical assistance to smaller colleges and counties in the application process to ensure equitable distribution of the grant award. 5832.3. (a) Community colleges and campuses in the California State University system that have been awarded grants pursuant to this part shall report annually to the respective Chancellor's Office and campuses in the University of California system shall report annually to the University of California Office of the President on the use of grant funds. This report shall include, but not be limited to, all of the following: (1) How grant funds and matching funds are being used. (2) Available evaluation data, including outcomes of the campus mental health programs funded pursuant to the grant program. (3) Program information regarding services being offered and the number of individuals being served. (b) The Chancellor's offices and the University of California Office of the President shallforwardelectronically submit the reports of the campuses required pursuant to subdivision (a), at one time annually, to the department, CalMHSA, and the Legislature for evaluation of the grant program. 5832.4. This part shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2022, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2022, deletes or extends that date.