LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB202
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB202
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB202
Compare Versions
AB202 Chaptered July 15, 2015
AB202 Enrolled July 2, 2015
AB202 Amended April 15, 2015
AB202 Amended April 6, 2015
AB202 Introduced January 29, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB202 Chaptered July 15, 2015
AB202 Enrolled July 2, 2015
AB202 Amended April 15, 2015
AB202 Amended April 6, 2015
AB202 Introduced January 29, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare