Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4231.) | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29). | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2016 | Read first time. To print. |