|
09/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 822, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5241.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 4678.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|