LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2022
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2022
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2022
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 16, 2016
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
August 26, 2016
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 21, 2016
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 15, 2016
Compare
Bill
March 31, 2016
Compare
Bill
March 28, 2016
Compare