California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2025 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 16, 2016
Bill June 9, 2016
Bill April 18, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016