California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2029 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2016

Amended

Bill August 16, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill April 20, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016