Assembly | 02/01/2016 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 07/13/2015 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Obernolte. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2015 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2015 | Read first time. To print. |