California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2031 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016