California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2032 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 5, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 22, 2016

Amended

Bill June 6, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016