Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/29/2016 | Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2016 | Read first time. To print. |