Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4594.) | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 20). | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/29/2016 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2016 | Read first time. To print. |